Tennessee – Haywood – Brownsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.insouth.com
Tennessee
Haywood
Brownsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
22020
1869
FDIC Certificate Number: 22020
FDIC's unique number: 15277
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 329550
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1869-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Brownsville Bank.
1975-05-15 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1975-05-15 Became FDIC insured.
1975-05-15 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1998-01-01 Changed name to Insouth Bank Of Brownsville .
1998-01-06 Acquired Insouth Bank Of Covington in Covington, Tennessee.
1998-01-06 Changed name to Insouth Bank .
1998-01-06 Acquired Insouth Bank Of Shelby County in Memphis, Tennessee.
Total assets: $331,475,000
Total deposits: $307,495,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $307,495,000
Equity capital: $21,713,000
Net income: $-1,240,000
Return on Assets: -0.72
Return on Equity: -11.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Independent Southern Bancshares, Inc. Esot
Insouth Bank - Atoka Branch
Insouth Bank - Highway 51 South Branch
Insouth Bank - Holly Park Branch
Insouth Bank - Insouth Bank
Insouth Bank - Millington Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
INSOUTH Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with INSOUTH Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and INSOUTH Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24405