Texas – Webb – Laredo
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ibc.com
Texas
Webb
Laredo
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
19629
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19629
FDIC's unique number: 13428
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1001152
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 253
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-03-28
1966-09-02 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Commerce Of Laredo.
1989-05-01 Acquired International Bank Of Commerce, National Association, San An in San Antonio, Texas.
1989-05-01 Changed name to International Bank Of Commerce .
1990-06-29 Acquired Valley Federal Savings Association in Mcallen, Texas.
1991-06-21 Acquired Travis Federal Savings And Loan Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1992-06-25 Acquired Castle Hills National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1994-09-01 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company in Port Lavaca, Texas.
1995-01-31 Acquired Bank Of Corpus Christi in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1995-09-08 Acquired Stone Oak National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1997-11-06 Acquired University Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-12-28 Acquired Nbc Bank, National Association in Eagle Pass, Texas.
2004-06-19 Acquired Local Oklahoma Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2007-03-16 Acquired Commercial State Bank in Sinton, Texas.
Total assets: $9,729,455,000
Total deposits: $6,457,387,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $6,457,387,000
Equity capital: $1,277,371,000
Net income: $59,809,000
Return on Assets: 1.21
Return on Equity: 9.72
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: International Bancshares Corporation
International Bank Of Commerce - 1461 24th Avenue Branch
International Bank Of Commerce - 20935 Us Highway 281 Branch
International Bank Of Commerce - 23rd & Trenton Branch
International Bank Of Commerce - 311 North Virginia Branch (Main
International Bank Of Commerce - 5615 Kirby Drive Branch (Main)
No associations
LandOfFree
International Bank of Commerce does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with International Bank of Commerce, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and International Bank of Commerce will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12474