New Jersey – Hudson – Kearny
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.kearnyfederalsavings.com
New Jersey
Hudson
Kearny
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
28765
1884
FDIC Certificate Number: 28765
FDIC's unique number: 41599
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 633378
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 702E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 41
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1884-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Kearny Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1995-01-18 Changed name to Kearny Federal Savings Bank .
1995-01-18 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1999-03-31 Acquired South Bergen Savings Bank in Wood-ridge, New Jersey.
2001-03-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2002-10-18 Acquired Pulaski Savings Bank in Springfield, New Jersey.
2003-07-01 Acquired West Essex Bank, Fsb in Caldwell, New Jersey.
2010-11-30 Acquired Central Jersey Bank, National Association in Oakhurst, New Jersey.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $2,896,454,000
Total deposits: $2,156,025,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,156,025,000
Equity capital: $458,509,000
Net income: $6,569,000
Return on Assets: 0.46
Return on Equity: 2.91
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Kearny Federal Savings Bank - Bayville Berkeley Plaza Branch
Kearny Federal Savings Bank - Belmar Branch
Kearny Federal Savings Bank - Bradley Beach Branch
Kearny Federal Savings Bank - Brick Branch
Kearny Federal Savings Bank - Caldwell Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Kearny Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Kearny Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Kearny Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25716