www.laconiasavings.com
New Hampshire
Belknap
Laconia
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
18012
1831
FDIC Certificate Number: 18012
FDIC's unique number: 11942
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 265407
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 21
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-12
1831-07-02 Institution established. Original name: Laconia Savings Bank.
1994-07-22 Acquired Homebank Federal Savings Association in Gilford, New Hampshire as part of a government assisted transaction.
1996-05-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1998-07-01 Reorganized.
1998-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2005-10-01 Acquired Village Bank & Trust Company in Gilford, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $1,082,872,000
Total deposits: $868,313,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $868,313,000
Equity capital: $113,802,000
Net income: $2,997,000
Return on Assets: 0.56
Return on Equity: 5.39
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Lsb Financial
Laconia Savings Bank - Antrim Branch
Laconia Savings Bank - Bedford Branch
Laconia Savings Bank - Claremont Branch
Laconia Savings Bank - Concord Branch
Laconia Savings Bank - Concord Heights Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Laconia Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Laconia Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Laconia Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19909