New Hampshire – Grafton – Lebanon
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.mascomabank.com
New Hampshire
Grafton
Lebanon
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
18013
1899
FDIC Certificate Number: 18013
FDIC's unique number: 11943
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 268006
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 713E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 18
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1899-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mascoma Savings Bank.
1996-01-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1996-01-04 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $979,063,000
Total deposits: $720,548,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $720,548,000
Equity capital: $97,330,000
Net income: $2,973,000
Return on Assets: 0.61
Return on Equity: 6.24
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Mascoma Savings Bank - Bethel Branch
Mascoma Savings Bank - Canaan Branch
Mascoma Savings Bank - Enfield Branch
Mascoma Savings Bank - Hanover Branch
Mascoma Savings Bank - Hanover Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Mascoma Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mascoma Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mascoma Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19908