Florida – Alachua – Gainesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.msbank.com
Florida
Alachua
Gainesville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
18116
1959
FDIC Certificate Number: 18116
FDIC's unique number: 12038
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Gainesville
Federal Reserve ID Number: 726234
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1959-11-25 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Hawthorne.
1976-11-05 Changed name to Lake Area State Bank .
1985-03-27 Changed name to Merchants & Southern Bank Of Alachua County .
1986-04-29 Moved bank headquarters from Hawthorne, Florida to Gainesville, Florida.
1988-03-26 Acquired Merchants & Southern Bank Of Ocala in Ocala, Florida.
1988-03-26 Changed name to Merchants & Southern Bank .
1988-09-23 Acquired Merchants And Southern Bank Of Clay County in Keystone Heights, Florida.
Total assets: $389,316,000
Total deposits: $316,222,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $316,222,000
Equity capital: $33,360,000
Net income: $1,200,000
Return on Assets: 0.62
Return on Equity: 7.61
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Merchants & Southern Banks Of Florida, Inc.
Merchants & Southern Bank - Archer Road Branch
Merchants & Southern Bank - Hawthorne Branch
Merchants & Southern Bank - High Springs Branch
Merchants & Southern Bank - Hunter's Crossing Branch
Merchants & Southern Bank - Keystone Heights Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Merchants & Southern Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Merchants & Southern Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants & Southern Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18574