www.nbarizona.com
Arizona
Pima
Tucson
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
20626
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 20626
FDIC's unique number: 14236
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1004368
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21383
Number of Domestic Offices: 74
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-09-11
1972-03-01 Institution established. Original name: Mission Bank.
1982-01-29 Changed name to Mesa Bank .
1987-05-01 Changed name to Zions First National Bank Of Arizona .
1987-12-31 Acquired The Camel Bank, Incorporated in Phoenix, Arizona.
1994-01-14 Acquired National Bank Of Arizona in Tucson, Arizona.
1994-01-14 Changed name to National Bank Of Arizona .
1994-01-14 Moved bank headquarters from Mesa, Arizona to Tucson, Arizona.
1994-04-29 Acquired Rio Salado Bank in Tempe, Arizona.
1996-05-31 Acquired Southern Arizona Bank Of Yuma in Yuma, Arizona.
1997-01-27 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-07-28 Acquired County Bank in Prescott, Arizona.
2002-11-25 Acquired Frontier State Bank in Show Low, Arizona.
2007-01-18 Acquired The Stockmen's Bank in Kingman, Arizona.
Total assets: $4,489,945,000
Total deposits: $3,758,951,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $3,758,951,000
Equity capital: $639,921,000
Net income: $11,967,000
Return on Assets: 0.54
Return on Equity: 3.78
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Zions Bancorporation
National Bank Of Arizona - 24th Street Branch
National Bank Of Arizona - 35th & Earll Branch
National Bank Of Arizona - Ajo Branch
National Bank Of Arizona - Benson Branch
National Bank Of Arizona - Biltmore Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
National Bank of Arizona does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with National Bank of Arizona, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and National Bank of Arizona will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9275