New Jersey – Bergen – Englewood Cliffs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.njcb.com
New Jersey
Bergen
Englewood Cliffs
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
57919
2005
FDIC Certificate Number: 57919
FDIC's unique number: 431394
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3317932
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-05-13
2005-01-15 Institution established. Original name: North Jersey Community Bank.
2009-05-01 Acquired Citizens Community Bank in Ridgewood, New Jersey as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $656,175,000
Total deposits: $530,323,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $530,323,000
Equity capital: $53,435,000
Net income: $3,157,000
Return on Assets: 1
Return on Equity: 12.26
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: North Jersey Community Bancorp, Inc.
North Jersey Community Bank - 1620 Lemoine Avenue Branch
North Jersey Community Bank - Cresskill Branch
North Jersey Community Bank - Hackensack Branch
North Jersey Community Bank - Holmdel Branch
North Jersey Community Bank - North Jersey Community Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
North Jersey Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with North Jersey Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Jersey Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10923