California – Shasta – Redding
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.novb.com
California
Shasta
Redding
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
20959
1973
FDIC Certificate Number: 20959
FDIC's unique number: 14475
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sacramento
Federal Reserve ID Number: 808167
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 26
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-08-03
1973-02-09 Institution established. Original name: North Valley Bank.
2001-11-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-11-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-01-01 Acquired Six Rivers Bank in Eureka, California.
2006-06-30 Acquired Nvb Business Bank in Woodland, California.
Total assets: $889,739,000
Total deposits: $759,949,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $759,949,000
Equity capital: $118,999,000
Net income: $2,112,000
Return on Assets: 0.48
Return on Equity: 3.64
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: North Valley Bancorp
North Valley Bank - Anderson Branch
North Valley Bank - Buenaventura Branch
North Valley Bank - Business Banking Center Branch
North Valley Bank - Churn Creek Branch
North Valley Bank - Cottonwood Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
North Valley Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with North Valley Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Valley Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23386