Maine – Androscoggin – Lewiston
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.northeastbank.com
Maine
Androscoggin
Lewiston
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
19690
1872
FDIC Certificate Number: 19690
FDIC's unique number: 13489
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 468806
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1872-02-05 Institution established. Original name: Bethel Savings Bank.
1984-02-15 Changed name to Bethel Savings Bank Fsb .
1984-02-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1987-08-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-07-01 Acquired Brunswick Federal Savings, F.A. in Brunswick, Maine.
1996-07-01 Changed name to Northeast Bank, F.S.B. .
1997-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Bethel, Maine to Auburn, Maine.
1997-10-24 Acquired Cushnoc Bank And Trust Company in Augusta, Maine.
2004-07-28 Changed name to Northeast Bank .
2004-07-28 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2004-07-28 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
2004-08-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2004-08-30 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2004-08-30 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2005-09-21 Moved bank headquarters from Auburn, Maine to Lewiston, Maine.
Total assets: $590,377,000
Total deposits: $402,168,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $402,168,000
Equity capital: $71,560,000
Net income: $669,000
Return on Assets: 0.22
Return on Equity: 1.84
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Northeast Bancorp
Northeast Bank - 186 Main Street Branch
Northeast Bank - Auburn Branch
Northeast Bank - Augusta Branch
Northeast Bank - Bethel Branch
Northeast Bank - Buckfield Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Northeast Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Northeast Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northeast Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21798