New Jersey – Cape May – Ocean City
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.ochome.com
New Jersey
Cape May
Ocean City
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
30273
1912
FDIC Certificate Number: 30273
FDIC's unique number: 43107
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3177
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 705E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-08-15
1912-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Ocean City Home Savings And Loan Association.
1997-11-21 Changed name to Ocean City Home Bank .
1997-11-21 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1998-04-22 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2011-08-01 Acquired Select Bank in Egg Harbor City, New Jersey.
Total assets: $851,140,000
Total deposits: $626,889,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $626,889,000
Equity capital: $88,242,000
Net income: $2,634,000
Return on Assets: 0.62
Return on Equity: 6.03
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Ocean City Home Bank - 105 Roosevelt Blvd Branch
Ocean City Home Bank - Absecon Branch
Ocean City Home Bank - Atlantic Ave Branch
Ocean City Home Bank - Egg Habor Branch
Ocean City Home Bank - Galloway Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Ocean City Home Bank has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 1.56 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is very bad.
If you have personal experience with Ocean City Home Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ocean City Home Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Ken
Yes. what is trademark? = proetct words, names, symbols, sounds, or colors that distinguish goods and services from those manufactured or sold by others and to indicate the source of the goods. Trademarks, unlike patents, can be renewed forever as long as they are being used in commerce.
Was this review helpful to you? Rating [ 1.56 ]
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1422