Maryland – Prince George's – Bowie
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.oldlinebank.com
Maryland
Prince George's
Bowie
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
27599
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 27599
FDIC's unique number: 40432
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1401387
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 19
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-04-12
1989-09-28 Institution established. Original name: Old Line National Bank.
2002-06-29 Changed name to Old Line Bank .
2002-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2002-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2006-07-10 Moved bank headquarters from Waldorf, Maryland to Bowie, Maryland.
2011-04-01 Acquired Maryland Bank And Trust Company, National Association in Lexington Park, Maryland.
Total assets: $752,931,000
Total deposits: $647,466,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $647,466,000
Equity capital: $63,049,000
Net income: $2,101,000
Return on Assets: 0.82
Return on Equity: 9.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Old Line Bancshares, Inc.
Old Line Bank - Accokeek Branch
Old Line Bank - Annapolis Branch
Old Line Bank - Bryans Road Branch
Old Line Bank - California Branch
Old Line Bank - Callaway Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Old Line Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Old Line Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Old Line Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-744