New Jersey – Somerset – Gladstone
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.pgbank.com
New Jersey
Somerset
Gladstone
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
11035
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 11035
FDIC's unique number: 7072
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 236706
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 23
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1921-09-21 Institution established. Original name: Peapack-gladstone Bank.
2000-01-08 Acquired Chatham Savings, Fsb in Chatham, New Jersey.
Total assets: $1,509,611,000
Total deposits: $1,363,733,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,363,733,000
Equity capital: $112,073,000
Net income: $4,279,000
Return on Assets: 0.57
Return on Equity: 7.73
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Peapack-Gladstone Financial Corporation
Peapack-Gladstone Bank - Bernardsville Branch
Peapack-Gladstone Bank - Bridgewater Branch
Peapack-Gladstone Bank - Califon-Lower Valley Branch
Peapack-Gladstone Bank - Chatham Branch
Peapack-Gladstone Bank - Chester Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Peapack-Gladstone Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Peapack-Gladstone Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Peapack-Gladstone Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3908