Illinois – Cass – Virginia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.petefishskiles.com
Illinois
Cass
Virginia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
10829
1870
FDIC Certificate Number: 10829
FDIC's unique number: 6928
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Il
Federal Reserve ID Number: 602543
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-08-04
1870-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Petefish, Skiles & Co.
2007-03-30 Acquired Peoples State Bank Of Chandlerville in Chandlerville, Illinois.
Total assets: $177,124,000
Total deposits: $152,745,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $152,745,000
Equity capital: $20,031,000
Net income: $1,246,000
Return on Assets: 1.42
Return on Equity: 13.21
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Petefish, Skiles Bancshares, Inc.
Petefish, Skiles & Co. - Chandlerville Branch
Petefish, Skiles & Co. - Greenview Facility
Petefish, Skiles & Co. - Havana Branch
Petefish, Skiles & Co. - Petefish, Skiles & Co.
Petefish, Skiles & Co. - Petersburg Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Petefish, Skiles & Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Petefish, Skiles & Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Petefish, Skiles & Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12621