Texas – Gonzales – Gonzales
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.sagecapitalbank.com
Texas
Gonzales
Gonzales
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
25621
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25621
FDIC's unique number: 17542
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 448554
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18303
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-01-13
1984-07-12 Institution established. Original name: American National Bank.
1997-05-09 Reorganized.
2009-07-01 Changed name to Sage Capital Bank, National Association .
Total assets: $260,267,000
Total deposits: $233,159,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $233,159,000
Equity capital: $25,988,000
Net income: $1,067,000
Return on Assets: 0.84
Return on Equity: 8.45
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Anb Bancshares, Inc.
Sage Capital Bank, National Association - American National Bank
Sage Capital Bank, National Association - Lockhart Branch
Sage Capital Bank, National Association - Luling Branch
Sage Capital Bank, National Association - New Braunfels Branch
Sage Capital Bank, National Association - Sage Capital Bank, Nat
No associations
LandOfFree
Sage Capital Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Sage Capital Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sage Capital Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26404