California – Santa Barbara – Santa Barbara
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.pcbancorp.com
California
Santa Barbara
Santa Barbara
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
18169
1960
FDIC Certificate Number: 18169
FDIC's unique number: 12090
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 785062
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24319
Number of Domestic Offices: 48
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-09
1960-03-17 Institution established. Original name: Santa Barbara National Bank.
1972-03-24 Changed name to Santa Barbara Bank & Trust .
1989-03-31 Acquired Community Bank Of Santa Ynez Valley in Solvang, California.
1995-07-07 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1997-04-01 Acquired First Valley Bank in Lompoc, California.
1997-10-01 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Santa Paula in Santa Paula, California.
2001-06-01 Acquired Los Robles Bank in Thousand Oaks, California.
2002-03-29 Reorganized.
2002-03-29 Changed name to Pacific Capital Bank, National Association .
2002-03-29 Acquired First National Bank Of Central California in Salinas, California.
2002-03-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2002-03-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-03-05 Acquired Pacific Crest Bank in Agoura Hills, California.
2005-08-01 Acquired First Bank Of San Luis Obispo in San Luis Obispo, California.
2011-05-26 Changed name to Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association .
Total assets: $5,833,807,000
Total deposits: $4,676,253,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $4,676,253,000
Equity capital: $683,833,000
Net income: $39,898,000
Return on Assets: 1.34
Return on Equity: 12.32
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Sb Acquisition Company, Llc
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association - Beverly Hills
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association - Camarillo Bra
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association - Camino Real B
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association - Carmel Branch
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association - Carpinteria B
No associations
LandOfFree
Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22797