Connecticut – Windham – Willimantic
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.savingsinstitute.com
Connecticut
Windham
Willimantic
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
18214
1842
FDIC Certificate Number: 18214
FDIC's unique number: 12134
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 480808
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 718E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 21
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1842-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Willimantic Savings Institute.
1990-09-24 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1990-10-19 Acquired The Brooklyn Savings Bank in Danielson, Connecticut.
1991-01-15 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Full Powers Granted, Exercised.
1991-03-18 Changed name to Savings Institute .
1991-08-16 Acquired Enfield National Bank in Enfield, Connecticut.
2000-06-14 Changed trust powers from Full Powers Granted, Exercised to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-06-14 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2004-08-06 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2004-08-06 Changed name to Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company .
2004-08-06 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2004-08-06 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $932,020,000
Total deposits: $701,250,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $701,250,000
Equity capital: $105,401,000
Net income: $1,301,000
Return on Assets: 0.28
Return on Equity: 2.74
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company - Brooklyn Branch
Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company - Canterbury Branch
Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company - Colchester Branch
Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company - Dayville Branch
Savings Institute Bank And Trust Company - East Hampton Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Savings Institute Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Savings Institute Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Savings Institute Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9187