New Jersey – Ocean – Toms River
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.shorecommunitybank.com
New Jersey
Ocean
Toms River
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34253
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34253
FDIC's unique number: 57012
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2539081
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-12-28
1997-02-24 Institution established. Original name: Shore Community Bank.
2005-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from Dover Township, New Jersey to Toms River, New Jersey.
Total assets: $207,432,000
Total deposits: $169,610,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $169,610,000
Equity capital: $20,130,000
Net income: $322,000
Return on Assets: 0.31
Return on Equity: 3.26
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Shore Community Bank - 201 Main Street Branch
Shore Community Bank - Jackson Branch
Shore Community Bank - Ortley Beach Branch
Shore Community Bank - Route 37 Branch
Shore Community Bank - Route 72 East Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Shore Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Shore Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Shore Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25328