www.southbridgesavingsbank.com
Massachusetts
Worcester
Southbridge
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
23524
1848
FDIC Certificate Number: 23524
FDIC's unique number: 16477
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 627407
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-10-14
1848-04-20 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Southbridge Savings Bank.
1981-09-08 Became FDIC insured.
1981-09-08 FDIC certificate number changed to .
2008-10-07 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
Total assets: $414,000,000
Total deposits: $318,433,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $318,433,000
Equity capital: $40,497,000
Net income: $1,183,000
Return on Assets: 0.57
Return on Equity: 6.02
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Green Valley Bancorp, Mhc
Southbridge Savings Bank - Charlton Branch
Southbridge Savings Bank - Holden Branch
Southbridge Savings Bank - North Oxford Branch
Southbridge Savings Bank - Southbridge Plaza Branch
Southbridge Savings Bank - Southbridge Savings Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Southbridge Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Southbridge Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southbridge Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20469