Georgia – McIntosh – Darien
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.southeasternbank.com
Georgia
McIntosh
Darien
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
5685
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 5685
FDIC's unique number: 3870
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Savannah
Federal Reserve ID Number: 210238
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 16
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-03-04
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Darien Bank.
1990-07-02 Acquired Southeastern Bank in Folkston, Georgia.
1990-07-02 Changed name to Southeastern Bank .
1997-05-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1998-06-26 Acquired Southeastern Bank Of Florida in Yulee, Florida.
Total assets: $429,214,000
Total deposits: $377,493,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $377,493,000
Equity capital: $43,727,000
Net income: $-151,000
Return on Assets: -0.07
Return on Equity: -0.71
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Southeastern Banking Corporation
Southeastern Bank - Brunswick Branch
Southeastern Bank - Callahan Branch
Southeastern Bank - Douglas Branch
Southeastern Bank - Eulonia Branch
Southeastern Bank - Folkston Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Southeastern Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Southeastern Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southeastern Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23520