Georgia – Muscogee – Columbus
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.synovus.com
Georgia
Muscogee
Columbus
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
873
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 873
FDIC's unique number: 556
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 395238
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 299
Number of Foreign Offices: 1
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-12
1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Columbus Bank And Trust Company.
1983-12-01 Acquired Buena Vista Loan & Savings Bank in Buena Vista, Georgia.
1985-05-29 Acquired First United Bank in Montezuma, Georgia.
1986-07-01 Acquired Bank Of Manchester in Manchester, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Commercial Bank in Thomasville, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Changed name to Synovus Bank .
2010-06-01 Acquired The National Bank Of South Carolina in Sumter, South Carolina.
2010-06-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Jasper in Jasper, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired Sea Island Bank in Statesboro, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Cb&t; Bank Of East Alabama in Phenix City, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company Of Valdosta in Valdosta, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired First Community Bank Of Tifton in Tifton, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Commercial Bank & Trust Company Of Troup County in Lagrange, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired The Coastal Bank Of Georgia in Brunswick, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Of Southeast Alabama in Dothan, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired Sb&t; Bank in Albany, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Bank Of Coweta in Newnan, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Coastal Bank And Trust Of Florida in Pensacola, Florida.
2010-06-01 Acquired Sterling Bank in Montgomery, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired Tallahassee State Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2010-06-01 Acquired First Commercial Bank Of Huntsville in Huntsville, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired Cb&t; Bank Of Middle Georgia in Warner Robins, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired First Commercial Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired First Coast Community Bank in Fernandina Beach, Florida.
2010-06-01 Acquired Georgia Bank & Trust in Calhoun, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired The Bank Of Tuscaloosa in Tuscaloosa, Alabama.
2010-06-01 Acquired Citizens First Bank in Rome, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Afb&t; in Athens, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Bank Of North Georgia in Alpharetta, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Acquired Synovus Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2010-06-01 Acquired Synovus Bank Of Jacksonville in Jacksonville, Florida.
2010-06-01 Acquired Cohutta Banking Company in Chattanooga, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.
Total assets: $27,908,468,000
Total deposits: $22,888,603,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $22,787,351,000
Equity capital: $2,925,152,000
Net income: $-52,928,000
Return on Assets: -0.37
Return on Equity: -3.61
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Synovus Financial Corp.
Synovus Bank - 1625 Frederica Road Branch
Synovus Bank - 49th Street Branch
Synovus Bank - 871 Warren Drive
Synovus Bank - 9th Avenue Branch
Synovus Bank - Academy Drive Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Synovus Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Synovus Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Synovus Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14918