Washington – Snohomish – Lynnwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.the-bank.com
Washington
Snohomish
Lynnwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34214
1996
FDIC Certificate Number: 34214
FDIC's unique number: 56972
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Seattle
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2485544
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1996-07-29 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Edmonds.
2000-12-28 Moved bank headquarters from Edmonds, Washington to Lynnwood, Washington.
2001-04-09 Changed name to The Bank Of Washington .
Total assets: $154,540,000
Total deposits: $132,055,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $132,055,000
Equity capital: $17,041,000
Net income: $21,000
Return on Assets: 0.03
Return on Equity: 0.25
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Washington Bancorp, Inc.
The Bank Of Washington - Edmonds Branch
The Bank Of Washington - Everett Branch
The Bank Of Washington - Issaquah Branch
The Bank Of Washington - Mukilteo Branch
The Bank Of Washington - Redmond Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bank of Washington does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bank of Washington, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Washington will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11936