Texas – Hopkins – Sulphur Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.bankatcnb.com
Texas
Hopkins
Sulphur Springs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
5544
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 5544
FDIC's unique number: 3767
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 596062
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3989
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-23
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs.
1998-12-31 Acquired First National Bank Of Sulphur Springs in Sulphur Springs, Texas.
2004-02-27 Acquired The First State Bank in Hawkins, Texas.
2011-03-12 Acquired The First National Bank Of Mineola in Mineola, Texas.
Total assets: $414,346,000
Total deposits: $375,898,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $375,898,000
Equity capital: $35,319,000
Net income: $2,027,000
Return on Assets: 1.02
Return on Equity: 11.72
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Sulphur Springs Bancshares, Inc.
The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs - City National Bank H
The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs - City National Bank H
The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs - First National Bank
The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs - Mockingbird Lane Bra
The City National Bank Of Sulphur Springs - Quitman Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18591