Pennsylvania – Wayne – Honesdale
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.thedimebank.com
Pennsylvania
Wayne
Honesdale
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
9888
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 9888
FDIC's unique number: 6326
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 56717
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Honesdale Dime Bank.
1986-09-05 Changed name to The Dime Bank .
1991-05-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1993-06-01 Reorganized.
1999-05-28 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $559,994,000
Total deposits: $452,798,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $452,798,000
Equity capital: $51,566,000
Net income: $3,002,000
Return on Assets: 1.1
Return on Equity: 11.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Dimeco, Inc
The Dime Bank - Damascus Branch
The Dime Bank - Dingmans Ferry Branch
The Dime Bank - Greentown Branch
The Dime Bank - Hawley Branch
The Dime Bank - Lake Region Office
No associations
LandOfFree
The Dime Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Dime Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Dime Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22352