Colorado – La Plata – Durango
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.fnbdurango.com
Colorado
La Plata
Durango
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
3014
1882
FDIC Certificate Number: 3014
FDIC's unique number: 1912
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 68859
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2637
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-13
1882-02-04 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Durango.
2007-04-24 Acquired The Bank Of Durango in Durango, Colorado.
Total assets: $410,790,000
Total deposits: $361,650,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $361,650,000
Equity capital: $43,960,000
Net income: $1,641,000
Return on Assets: 0.82
Return on Equity: 7.74
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Bancorp. Of Durango, Inc.
The First National Bank Of Durango - 1st National Messenger Bran
The First National Bank Of Durango - Albertsons Office Branch
The First National Bank Of Durango - Bayfield Office Branch
The First National Bank Of Durango - Bodo Office Branch
The First National Bank Of Durango - The First National Bank Of
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Durango does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Durango, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Durango will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24729