Vermont – Lamoille – Morrisville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.unionbankvt.com
Vermont
Lamoille
Morrisville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
14158
1891
FDIC Certificate Number: 14158
FDIC's unique number: 8840
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 333203
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 17
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-13
1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Union Savings Bank & Trust Company.
1970-01-01 Changed name to The Union Savings Bank And Trust Company .
1974-06-13 Changed name to The Union Bank .
1983-01-06 Changed name to Union Bank .
2003-05-16 Acquired Citizens Savings Bank And Trust Company in Saint Johnsbury, Vermont.
Total assets: $512,660,000
Total deposits: $434,883,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $434,883,000
Equity capital: $41,657,000
Net income: $2,178,000
Return on Assets: 0.92
Return on Equity: 10.47
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Union Bankshares, Inc.
Union Bank - Danville Branch
Union Bank - Fairfax Branch
Union Bank - Green Mountain Mall Branch
Union Bank - Groveton Branch
Union Bank - Hardwick Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Union Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Union Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18242